KY HB335 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-28 - recommitted to Banking & Insurance (S)
Pending: Senate Banking and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-28 - recommitted to Banking & Insurance (S)
Pending: Senate Banking and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of Subtitle 9 of KRS Chapter 304 to define terms; require title insurance agents to be licensed by the Department of Insurance; require a title insurance agent to provde a good-faith estimate of the premium upon the issuance of a title insurance commitment for a specified dollar amount; allow the commissioner to promulgate administrative regulations; amend KRS 304.9-030 to include title insurance as a type of insurance for which an agent may receive a qualification; amend KRS 304.22-030 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to title insurance.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Greer [D] | Rep. Steven Riggs [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-28 | Senate | recommitted to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2016-03-25 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2016-03-24 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 25, 2016 |
2016-03-21 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2016-03-21 | Senate | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day |
2016-03-18 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2016-03-17 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 18, 2016 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-15 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-02-19 | Senate | to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2016-02-17 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-02-16 | House | 3rd reading, passed 92-1 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-02-11 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 16, 2016 |
2016-02-11 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-02-10 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-02-08 | House | posted in committee |
2016-02-08 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2016-02-04 | House | introduced in House |