KY HB338 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 80)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 80)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 136.392 to provide that the insurance premium surcharge rate calculated by the commissioner of revenue and related to the commissioner of insurance for the purpose of informing the affected insurers shall take effect no earlier than six months from the date that the commissioner of insurance notifies the affected insurers; delete the requirement that the commissioner of revenue calculate the appropriate rate no later than January 1 of each year; delete the requirement that the adjustment process shall continue on a biennial basis.
Title
AN ACT relating to delaying the effective date of insurance premium surcharge increases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 80) | |
2012-03-30 | delivered to Governor | |
2012-03-30 | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate | |
2012-03-27 | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House | |
2012-03-27 | received in House | |
2012-03-26 | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 | |
2012-03-26 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 26, 2012 | |
2012-03-22 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-03-21 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2012-02-27 | to Banking & Insurance (S) | |
2012-02-23 | received in Senate | |
2012-02-22 | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 | |
2012-02-16 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 22, 2012 | |
2012-02-16 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-02-15 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2012-02-02 | posted in committee | |
2012-01-30 | to Banking & Insurance (H) | |
2012-01-27 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB338.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB338/bill.doc |