KY HB344 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - discharge petition filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - discharge petition filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 65 to establish the parameters and requirements for the levy of local option sales and use taxes, if a proposed constitutional amendment allowing such a levy is approved; create a new section of KRS Chapter 139 to establish tax administration provisions; amend KRS 139.570, 139.670, 139.778, 144.132, and 183.525 to conform; amend KRS 131.190 to allow the Department of Revenue to share information related to the local option, sales and use taxes with local jurisdictions imposing the tax; provide that the provisions of the Act will be effective on January 1, 2017, only if the proposed constitutional amendment is approved by the voters of the Commonwealth at the November 2016 general election; if the proposed amendment is not approved, the Act is void.
Title
AN ACT relating to local option sales and use taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-11 | Senate | discharge petition filed |
2015-02-19 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2015-02-13 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-02-12 | House | 3rd reading, passed 57-38 |
2015-02-12 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 12, 2015 |
2015-02-12 | House | taken from Rules |
2015-02-11 | House | reported favorably, to Rules |
2015-02-10 | House | returned to Local Government (H) |
2015-02-10 | House | 2nd reading |
2015-02-10 | House | taken from Local Government (H) |
2015-02-09 | House | posted in committee |
2015-02-09 | House | returned to Local Government (H) |
2015-02-09 | House | 1st reading |
2015-02-09 | House | taken from Local Government (H) |
2015-02-09 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2015-02-06 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB344.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB344/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB344/vote_history.pdf |