KY HB350 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 133)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 133)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 304.2-205 and KRS 304.3-240 to require electronic filings; amend KRS 304.2-230 to add analysts to insurance examination provisions; amend KRS 304.5-140 to provide additional authority for the insurance commissioner relating to the assuming insurer list; amend KRS 304.6-134 to remove requirement that a domestic company report total adjusted capital of at least 450% of authorized control level risk-based capital in order to qualify for an exemption from NAIC valuation manual standards; amend KRS 304.17A-300 to terminate the issuance of certificates of filing for provider-sponsored integrated health delivery networks; amend KRS 304.37-010 to modify definition of "commissioner" and add definition for "NAIC"; amend KRS 304.37-020 to add definitions; require certain insurance holding company systems to file an annual group capital calculation with a lead state insurance commissioner; require certain insurance holding company systems scoped into the NAIC Liquidity Stress Test Framework to file liquidity stress test results with a lead state insurance commissioner; amend KRS 304.37-050 to modify confidentiality provisions relating to documents, materials, or other information in the possession of the insurance commissioner; add confidentiality provisions for group capital calculations and liquidity stress test results; make technical amendments throughout.
Title
AN ACT relating to insurance regulatory requirements.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Gooch [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 431 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2221 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 196 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2221 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 196 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 133) |
2022-03-30 | House | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-29 | House | passed 93-0 |
2022-03-29 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-29 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-25 | House | to Rules (H) |
2022-03-25 | House | received in House |
2022-03-25 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 34-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 25, 2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2022-03-22 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-03-02 | House | 3rd reading, passed 98-0 |
2022-02-24 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 25, 2022 |
2022-02-24 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-02-23 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-01-25 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2022-01-24 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-24 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Insurance
Insurance, Health
International Trade and Relations
Interstate Cooperation
Reports Mandated
State Agencies
Technical Corrections
Insurance
Insurance, Health
International Trade and Relations
Interstate Cooperation
Reports Mandated
State Agencies
Technical Corrections