KY HB370 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-03 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-03 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 158.148 to require the discipline code to prohibit harassment, intimidation, bullying, or cyberbullying against students and define term; amend KRS 525.070 to expand the crime of harassment to include harassment, intimidation, bullying, or cyberbulling as defined in KRS 158.148 by students on school property and at school-sponsored events.
Title
AN ACT relating to school safety.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Burch [D] | Rep. Kelly Flood [D] | Rep. Joni Jenkins [D] | Rep. Mary Marzian [D] |
Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D] | Rep. Arnold Simpson [D] | Rep. Jim Wayne [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-03 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2011-02-24 | floor amendment (3) filed | |
2011-02-23 | floor amendments (1) and (2) filed | |
2011-02-23 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 24, 2011 | |
2011-02-23 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-22 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2011-02-11 | posted in committee | |
2011-02-08 | to Education (H) | |
2011-02-07 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB370.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB370/bill.doc |