KY HB374 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - posted in committee
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - posted in committee
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 141.200 to require combined reporting of business income; amend KRS 141.120 to implement a throwback rule for income not taxed elsewhere; amend KRS 141.205 to disallow tax haven transactions; amend KRS 136.310, 136.530, 141.040, 141.0401, 141.121, 141.206, and 141.420 to conform; amend KRS 141.066 and 141.0205 to implement a Kentucky earned income tax credit; provide that the Act applies to tax years beginning on and after January 1, 2016.
Title
AN ACT relating to taxation.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Wayne [D] | Rep. Gregory Stumbo [D] | Rep. Johnny Bell [D] | Rep. Joni Jenkins [D] |
Rep. Mary Marzian [D] | Rep. Rick Rand [D] | Rep. Jody Richards [D] | Rep. Tom Riner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | House | posted in committee |
2015-02-10 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2015-02-09 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB374.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB374/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB374/FN.doc |