KY HB374 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-21 - floor amendment (3) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-21 - floor amendment (3) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 65 to establish the parameters and requirements for the levy of local option sales and use taxes, if a proposed constitutional amendment allowing such a levy is approved; create a new section of KRS Chapter 139 to establish tax administration provisions; amend KRS 139.570, 139.670, 139.778, 144.132, and 183.525 to conform; amend KRS 131.190 to allow the Department of Revenue to share information related to the local option sales and use taxes with local jurisdictions imposing the tax; provide that the provisions of the Act will be effective on January 1, 2017, only if the proposed constitutional amendment is approved by the voters of the Commonwealth at the November 2016 general election; if the proposed amendment is not approved, the Act is void.
Title
AN ACT relating to local option sales and use taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | Senate | floor amendment (3) filed |
2016-03-17 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2016-03-16 | Senate | floor amendment (1) and (2) filed |
2016-03-14 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-03-11 | House | 3rd reading, passed 55-36 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-03-10 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 11, 2016 |
2016-03-10 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-09 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-02-11 | House | posted in committee |
2016-02-10 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2016-02-09 | House | introduced in House |