KY HB377 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-23 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-23 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS 315 to define terms; require the Board of Pharmacy to publish and, in some cases, determine qualifying drugs for a list of opioid analgesics that incorporate tamper-resistance technologies and prohibit substitution or interchange of those drugs without the pharmacy verifying that the substitute provides substantially similar tamper-resistance properties as determined by the board or without obtaining written consent of the prescriber; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to the substitution of opioids in pharmacies and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Burch [D] | Rep. John Carney [R] | Rep. Bob DeWeese [R] | Rep. Jeff Hoover [R] |
Rep. Marie Rader [R] | Rep. Sal Santoro [R] | Rep. Ben Waide [R] | Rep. Susan Westrom [D] |
Rep. Addia Wuchner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2012-03-23 | taken from the Regular Orders of the Day | |
2012-03-09 | floor amendment (3) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (4-title) filed | |
2012-03-07 | floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute | |
2012-02-29 | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day | |
2012-02-28 | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute | |
2012-02-27 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 29, 2012 | |
2012-02-24 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-02-23 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2012-02-13 | posted in committee | |
2012-02-09 | to Health & Welfare (H) | |
2012-02-08 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB377.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB377/bill.doc |