KY HB380 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - to Judiciary (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - to Judiciary (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 383.500 to apply the Uniform Residential Landlord and Tenant Act on a statewide basis; repeal, reenact, and amend the various sections of KRS Chapter 383 constituting that Act without substantive change.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Uniform Residential Landlord and Tenant Act.
Sponsors
Rep. James Glenn [D] | Rep. Linda Belcher [D] | Rep. Dennis Horlander [D] | Rep. Mary Marzian [D] |
Rep. Arnold Simpson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-28 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2016-03-23 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-03-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 47-46 |
2016-03-21 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 22, 2016 |
2016-03-21 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-18 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2016-03-14 | House | posted in committee |
2016-02-11 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2016-02-10 | House | introduced in House |