KY HB390 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 206)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 206)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 154.10-010 to add the Commissioner of Agriculture as a voting member to the Kentucky Economic Development Partnership and change the quorum from seven to eight members; amend KRS 154.20-010 to require one member of the Kentucky Economic Development Finance Authority to have experience in agriculture.
Title
AN ACT relating to economic development.
Sponsors
Rep. Kim King [R] | Rep. Jason Petrie [R] | Rep. David Hale [R] | Rep. Mark Hart [R] |
Rep. Richard Heath [R] | Rep. Phillip Pratt [R] | Rep. Brandon Reed [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2367 (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 534 (Y: 76 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 438 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2222 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 156 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 534 (Y: 76 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 438 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2222 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 156 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | Senate | delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 206) |
2022-04-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-04-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-04-14 | Senate | received in House |
2022-04-13 | House | passed 29-5 |
2022-04-13 | House | veto overridden |
2022-04-13 | House | posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto |
2022-04-13 | House | to Rules (S) |
2022-04-13 | House | received in Senate |
2022-04-13 | Senate | passed 76-20 |
2022-04-13 | Senate | veto overridden |
2022-04-13 | Senate | posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto |
2022-04-13 | Senate | taken from Rules |
2022-04-13 | Senate | to Rules (H) |
2022-04-13 | Senate | received in House |
2022-04-08 | House | Vetoed |
2022-03-30 | House | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-29 | House | passed 91-0 |
2022-03-29 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-29 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-25 | House | to Rules (H) |
2022-03-25 | House | received in House |
2022-03-25 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 34-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 25, 2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2022-03-22 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-02-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 94-0 |
2022-02-18 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 22, 2022 |
2022-02-18 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-02-17 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-02-09 | House | to Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H) |
2022-01-27 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-27 | House | introduced in House |