KY HB40 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 2 designating the last Wednesday in September of each year as A Day of Prayer for Kentucky's Students.
Title
AN ACT relating to a day of prayer for students.
Sponsors
Rep. Regina Huff [R] | Rep. John Blanton [R] | Rep. David Hale [R] | Rep. Brandon Reed [R] |
Rep. James Tipton [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 310 (Y: 83 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2018-03-16 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-03-15 | House | 3rd reading, passed 83-5 |
2018-03-14 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 15, 2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-13 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2018-03-09 | House | posted in committee |
2018-01-02 | House | to Education (H) |
2018-01-02 | House | introduced in House |
2017-09-15 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/HB40.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB40/bill.pdf |
Roll Call | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/HB40/vote_history.pdf |