KY HB415 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 39)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 39)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 243.075 to stipulate that in a county in which both the city and county levy a regulatory license fee, only the county fee shall be applicable outside the jurisdiction of the city; require new fees enacted by a city or county to be enacted within two years of the date of the local option election authorizing alcohol sales; fees enacted shall be at a rate that will not generate revenue in excess of expenses actually incurred; require the Department of Alcoholic Beverage Control to promulgate administrative regulations establishing a process whereby cities and counties may estimate expenses during the first year after the discontinuance of prohibition; require revenue received from the regulatory license fee to be spent only in accordance with established requirements; require fees to be reduced by an amount equal to alcohol-related taxes and fees received; require violators to pay attorney's fees and costs incurred by aggrieved persons and to forfeit the right to impose regulatory license fees.
Title
AN ACT relating to alcohol regulatory fees.
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Keene [D] | Rep. Dennis Horlander [D] | Sen. Julie Raque Adams [R] | Rep. Sal Santoro [R] |
Rep. Diane St Onge [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 39) |
2014-03-26 | House | delivered to Governor |
2014-03-26 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2014-03-25 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2014-03-24 | House | received in House |
2014-03-24 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 31-7 |
2014-03-21 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 24, 2014 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-03-18 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2014-03-13 | Senate | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-03-10 | House | 3rd reading, passed 76-19 with Committee Substitute |
2014-03-06 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 10, 2014 |
2014-03-06 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-03-05 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2014-02-24 | House | posted in committee |
2014-02-24 | House | posting waived |
2014-02-24 | House | to Licensing & Occupations (H) |
2014-02-20 | House | introduced in House |