KY HB415 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-12 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 13)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-12 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 13)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 243.027 to clarify requirements to hold direct shipper license, allow the usage of a third party to fulfill orders, require licensees to register with the Department of Revenue, and allow Kentucky manufacturers with a direct shippers license to send samples under certain conditions; amend KRS 243.028 to conform with third party shipments; amend KRS 241.060 to clarify administrative regulation for direct shipper license application; amend KRS 243.020 to allow for third party shipments and to remove limitations on storage; amend KRS 243.029 to remove parameters for establishing wholesale cost; amend KRS 243.110 to specify that a brewer, microbrewery, distilled spirits and wine supplier, and malt beverage supplier may also hold a direct shipper license; amend KRS 243.220, 243.380, 243.390, and 243.450 to exempt direct shipper licensees from requirements therein; amend KRS 243.790 to remove retail outlets from specifications; amend KRS 243.0305 to clarify which sales distillers are required to physically transfer product; amend KRS 243.884 to include direct shipper licensees in wholesale tax and set specifications; amend KRS 244.220 to set requirement for special licenses; amend KRS 244.050 to specify retailer may not sell below cost; repeal KRS 243.886; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to alcoholic beverages and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Adam Koenig [R] | Rep. Kevin Bratcher [R] | Rep. Daniel Fister [R] | Rep. Mark Hart [R] |
Rep. Thomas Huff [R] | Rep. Ed Massey [R] | Rep. Phillip Pratt [R] | Rep. Russell Webber [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1655 (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 135 (Y: 82 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - House: Adopt HFA 1 RCS# 134 (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 135 (Y: 82 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - House: Adopt HFA 1 RCS# 134 (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-12 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 13) |
2021-03-11 | House | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-11 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-11 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-11 | House | received in House |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 29-5 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 5, 2021 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-02 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-03-01 | Senate | to Licensing & Occupations (S) |
2021-03-01 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-03-01 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-02-26 | House | 3rd reading, passed 82-15 with floor amendments (1), (2), (4), (5), and (3-title) |
2021-02-25 | House | floor amendments (2), (3-title), (4) and (5) filed |
2021-02-24 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2021-02-11 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 16, 2021 |
2021-02-11 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-10 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-02-09 | House | posted in committee |
2021-02-09 | House | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (H) |
2021-02-09 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-02-09 | House | introduced in House |