KY HB419 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-25 - floor amendment (1) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-25 - floor amendment (1) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 146 to establish the Kentucky land stewardship and conservation fund; amend KRS 146.560 to add the director of the Division of Forestry or designee to the Kentucky Heritage Land Conservation Fund Board; add one gubernatorial appointee nominated by the Kentucky Land Trusts Coalition to the board; amend KRS 146.570 to allow the board to allocate funds to private, nonprofit land conservation organizations; APPROPRIATION.
Title
AN ACT relating to land conservation and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | floor amendment (1) filed | |
2010-03-25 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-03-24 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2010-03-09 | to Natural Resources and Energy (S) | |
2010-03-05 | received in Senate | |
2010-03-04 | 3rd reading, passed 91-2 | |
2010-03-03 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 4, 2010 | |
2010-03-03 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-03-02 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2010-02-26 | posted in committee | |
2010-02-12 | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2010-02-10 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB419.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB419/bill.doc |