KY HB419 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 141 to allow individuals with an income tax refund to desginate a portion of the refund to the rape crisis center trust fund; create a new section of KRS Chapter 211 to establish the rape crisis center trust fund.
Title
AN ACT relating to an income tax refund check-off for the rape crisis centers in Kentucky and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-02 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2015-02-26 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-02-25 | House | 3rd reading, passed 98-0 |
2015-02-24 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2015-02-24 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 26, 2015 |
2015-02-24 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill |
2015-02-23 | House | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2015-02-23 | House | 1st reading |
2015-02-23 | House | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2015-02-13 | House | posted in committee |
2015-02-11 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2015-02-10 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB419.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB419/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB419/vote_history.pdf |