KY HB419 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-14 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-14 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 132.410 to require a current copy of all digital parcel and tax district data be securely stored with the Commonwealth Office of Technology's geographic information clearinghouse; require the Department of Revenue to coordinate annual updates of the data; allow executive branch employees access the data to perform their duties; restrict digital parcel data and tax data from being redistributed, sold, shared or used for any commercial or unauthorized purposes; amend KRS 42.740 to reduce the number of candidates or lists submitted to the Governor for appointment to the Geographic Information Advisory Council by the Kentucky Association of Counites and Kentucky League of Cities from six each to three each; require the coordination of annual updates by the Department of Revenue begin July 1, 2023; amend KRS 133.047 and 42.744 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to state geographic information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-07 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 157 (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-14 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2023-03-08 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2023-03-08 | Senate | received in Senate |
2023-03-07 | House | 3rd reading, passed 94-4 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2023-03-03 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 07, 2023 |
2023-03-03 | House | recommitted to Rules (H) |
2023-03-03 | House | taken from the Orders of the Day |
2023-03-02 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 03, 2023 |
2023-03-02 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2023-03-01 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2023-02-24 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2023-02-21 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-02-21 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Advisory Boards, Commissions, and Committees
Information Technology
Property Valuation Administrators
State Agencies
Information Technology
Property Valuation Administrators
State Agencies