KY HB429 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-17 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-17 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 150 relating to fish and wildlife to require the law enforcement director and conservation officers to be certified peace officers; provide full peace officer powers while on department property and limit peace officer powers to enforcement of KRS Chapters 150 and 235 when not on department property; provide that appointments to the Fish and Wildlife Commission are subject to confirmation by the Senate; provide that no person who has been convicted of a fish and wildlife violation be appointed to the commission; require that the department hold hearings on proposed administrative regulations affecting persons surrounding department property in the vicinity of the property; permit a person to kill an animal in self-defense or defense of another or during a survival or disaster situation; create a new section of KRS Chapter 150 to create a no-net-loss-for-hunting policy; create a new section of KRS Chapter 150 to penalize hunting game with a firearm which cannot be hunted with a firearm during bow season; amend numerous sections of KRS Chapter 150 creating fish and wildlife offenses to require a culpable mental state of "knowingly" for the violations; amend KRS 150.395 relating to spotlighting to expand legitimate uses of lights in the field at night; amend KRS 235.010 relating to boating to specify that a person must be navigating a vessel to be operating a vessel; amend numerous sections of KRS Chapter 235 to establish a culpable mental state of "knowingly" for the violations.
Title
AN ACT relating to criminal and regulatory matters under the jurisdiction of the Department of Fish and Wildlife Resources including the management and enforcement thereof.
Sponsors
Rep. Johnny Bell [D] | Rep. Robert Damron [D] | Rep. Keith Hall [D] | Rep. Martha King [D] |
Rep. Rick Nelson [D] | Rep. Tommy Turner [R] | Rep. Ken Upchurch [R] | Rep. Brent Yonts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | to Judiciary (S) | |
2010-03-16 | received in Senate | |
2010-03-15 | 3rd reading, passed 90-3 with floor amendments (1) and (3) | |
2010-03-08 | floor amendments (2) and (3) filed | |
2010-03-05 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 8, 2010 | |
2010-03-05 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-03-04 | floor amendment (1) filed | |
2010-03-04 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with committee amendment (1) | |
2010-02-18 | posted in committee | |
2010-02-17 | to Natural Resources & Environment (H) | |
2010-02-12 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB429.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB429/bill.doc |