KY HB441 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-19 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 38)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-19 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 38)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 175B.015 and 175B.040 to authorize administrative regulations establishing toll collection procedures and appeals procedures, require compliance with toll regulations, provide for administrative suspension of vehicle registration, and require that all individual information relating to tolls shall be confidential; encourage any entity developing a tolled facility to consider "ability to pay" when establishing toll rates.
Title
AN ACT relating to toll administration.
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Clark [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-19 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 38) |
2013-03-12 | House | delivered to Governor |
2013-03-12 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2013-03-11 | House | received in House |
2013-03-07 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 31-5 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2013 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-03-05 | Senate | returned to Transportation (S) |
2013-03-05 | Senate | 1st reading |
2013-03-05 | Senate | taken from Transportation (S) |
2013-03-05 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2013-03-04 | Senate | received in Senate |
2013-03-01 | House | 3rd reading, passed 69-17 |
2013-02-28 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2013-02-27 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 1, 2013 |
2013-02-27 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-26 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2013-02-22 | House | posted in committee |
2013-02-20 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2013-02-19 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/HB441.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/HB441/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/HB441/vote_history.pdf |