KY HB45 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 42)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 42)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 164.740 to define a comprehensive transition and postsecondary program; amend KRS 164.7535 and 164.785 to provide grants to students enrolled in a comprehensive transition and postsecondary program; create a new section of KRS 164.7874 to 164.7885 to provide Kentucky Educational Excellence Scholarships to students enrolled in a comprehensive transition and postsecondary program.
Title
AN ACT relating to postsecondary financial aid for students with intellectual disabilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Carl Rollins [D] | Rep. Tom Riner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 42) |
2013-03-12 | House | delivered to Governor |
2013-03-12 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2013-03-12 | House | received in House |
2013-03-07 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2013 |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-28 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2013-02-21 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2013-02-19 | Senate | received in Senate |
2013-02-15 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 |
2013-02-13 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 15, 2013 |
2013-02-13 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-12 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2013-02-06 | House | posted in committee |
2013-01-08 | House | to Education (H) |
2013-01-08 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/HB45.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/HB45/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/HB45/vote_history.pdf |