KY HB452 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-17 - returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-17 - returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 132.220 to restore language previously in the statutes relating to interests in property that can be assessed for taxes and establishing a priority among various individuals with interests in property relating to taxes; amend KRS 133.130 to clarify the process for exonerating asssessments; amend KRS 134.010 to amend the definition of "taxpayer" to conform to other definitions of "taxpayer" used throughout the statutes relating to property taxes.
Title
AN ACT relating to property taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-17 | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2011-02-17 | 2nd reading | |
2011-02-17 | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2011-02-16 | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2011-02-16 | 1st reading | |
2011-02-16 | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2011-02-14 | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2011-02-11 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB452.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB452/bill.doc |