KY HB456 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 65)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 65)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend various KRS sections to rename the Kentucky Department of Travel as the Kentucky Department of Travel and Tourism.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Kentucky Department of Travel.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 65) | |
2010-03-26 | delivered to Governor | |
2010-03-26 | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate | |
2010-03-25 | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House | |
2010-03-25 | received in House | |
2010-03-25 | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 | |
2010-03-24 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 25, 2010 | |
2010-03-17 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-03-16 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2010-03-08 | to Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S) | |
2010-03-04 | received in Senate | |
2010-03-03 | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 | |
2010-02-26 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 3, 2010 | |
2010-02-26 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-02-25 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2010-02-23 | posted in committee | |
2010-02-22 | to Tourism Development & Energy (H) | |
2010-02-18 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB456.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB456/bill.doc |