KY HB485 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 146)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 146)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 446 to provide that the Kentucky Revised Statutes shall no longer utilize the terms "mental retardation" or "mentally retarded" or abbreviations that use the letters "MR" to signify mental retardation or mentally retarded; set forth terms that shall be used instead, including "intellectual disability," "intellectual disabilities," "individual with an intellectual disability," "individuals with an intellectual disability," "individual with a serious intellectual disability," or "individuals with a serious intellectual disability"; clarify that the new terms shall be understood to have the exact meaning as the terms that they replace; change the names of ICF/MRs to ICF/IDs to the extent permitted by federal law; amend various sections of the Kentucky Revised Statutes to replace all occurrences of the old terms in statutes with the new terms, including the names of agencies, boards, care facilities, services, programs, professionals, diagnoses, the title of a chapter, and the names of nongovernmental entities that have incorporated the new terminology.
Title
AN ACT relating to individuals with intellectual disabilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Kelly Flood [D] | Sen. Sara Gregory [R] | Rep. Joni Jenkins [D] | Rep. Mary Marzian [D] |
Rep. Terry Mills [D] | Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D] | Rep. Tanya Pullin [D] | Rep. Ryan Quarles [R] |
Rep. Tom Riner [D] | Rep. Carl Rollins [D] | Rep. Brent Yonts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 146) | |
2012-04-12 | delivered to Governor | |
2012-04-12 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2012-04-12 | received in House | |
2012-04-12 | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 | |
2012-04-12 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders (2) of the Day for Thursday, April 12, 2012 | |
2012-04-12 | reported favorably, to Rules as a Consent Bill | |
2012-03-30 | recommitted to Health & Welfare (S) | |
2012-03-28 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-03-27 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2012-03-26 | to Health & Welfare (S) | |
2012-03-22 | received in Senate | |
2012-03-21 | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 with Committee Substitute | |
2012-03-20 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 21, 2012 | |
2012-03-16 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-03-15 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2012-03-05 | posted in committee | |
2012-02-29 | to Health & Welfare (H) | |
2012-02-28 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB485.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB485/bill.doc |