KY HB493 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 57)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 57)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amends KRS 194A.705 to limit the provision of enumerated health and health-related services to assisted living communities and nursing homes.
Title
AN ACT relating to assisted living communities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 3163 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 138 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 138 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 57) |
2024-03-28 | House | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-28 | House | received in House |
2024-03-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 28, 2024 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules |
2024-03-26 | Senate | returned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2024-03-26 | Senate | taken from Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2024-03-25 | Senate | returned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2024-03-25 | Senate | 1st reading |
2024-03-25 | Senate | taken from Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2024-03-25 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2024-02-23 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-02-23 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-02-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 91-0 |
2024-02-21 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 22, 2024 |
2024-02-16 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-15 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-02-14 | House | to Health Services (H) |
2024-02-08 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-02-08 | House | introduced in House |