KY HB498 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 129)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 129)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amends KRS 304.5-140 to limit the definition of “reciprocal jurisdiction” in certain provisions and to except certain provisions to the extent that the provisions conflict with a covered agreement; amends KRS 304.6-134 to modify exemptions from KRS 304.6-143 and 304.6-151; and amends KRS 304.37-020 to allow the commissioner of insurance to establish a timeframe for insurers to report material changes or additions to registrations.
Title
AN ACT relating to insurance financial standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 3146 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 137 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 137 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 129) |
2024-03-28 | House | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-28 | House | received in House |
2024-03-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2024-03-26 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2024-03-25 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 26, 2024 |
2024-03-22 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2024-03-21 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2024-03-11 | Senate | to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2024-02-23 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-02-23 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-02-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 91-0 |
2024-02-21 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 22, 2024 |
2024-02-15 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-14 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-02-13 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2024-02-09 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-02-09 | House | introduced in House |