KY HB499 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 28 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-08 - filed without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 28 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-08 - filed without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
The Legislative Branch Budget: appropriate from the General Fund $59,311,100 for fiscal year 2016-2017 and $63,206,600 in fiscal year 2017-2018; appropriate from Restricted Funds $75,000 in fiscal year 2016-2017 and $175,000 in fiscal year 2017-2018, with appropriations allocated as follows:
Title
AN ACT making appropriations for the operations, maintenance, and support of the Legislative Branch of the Commonwealth of Kentucky.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Rand [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | House | filed without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State |
2016-03-28 | House | delivered to Governor |
2016-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2016-03-28 | House | received in House |
2016-03-25 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 |
2016-03-25 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 25, 2015 |
2016-03-25 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules |
2016-03-21 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2016-03-18 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2016-03-18 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2016-03-18 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2016-03-17 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2016-03-17 | Senate | 1st reading |
2016-03-17 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2016-03-17 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-03-16 | House | 3rd reading, passed 69-31 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-03-15 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 16, 2016 |
2016-03-15 | House | taken from Rules |
2016-03-15 | House | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-03-10 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2016-03-09 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-08 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2016-02-26 | House | posted in committee |
2016-02-26 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2016-02-25 | House | introduced in House |