KY HB51 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-04 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 6)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-04 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 6)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 156.095 to require the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to post suicide prevention awareness and training information on its Web page by August 1, 2010; require every public middle and high school administrator to disseminate suicide prevention awareness information to all middle and high school students by September 1, 2010, and September 1 of each year thereafter.
Title
AN ACT relating to suicide prevention training.
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Belcher [D] | Rep. Dennis Horlander [D] | Rep. Brad Montell [R] | Rep. Rick Nelson [D] |
Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D] | Rep. Tom Riner [D] | Rep. John Tilley [D] | Rep. David Watkins [D] |
Rep. Brent Yonts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-04 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 6) | |
2010-02-24 | delivered to Governor | |
2010-02-24 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2010-02-24 | received in House | |
2010-02-23 | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 | |
2010-02-22 | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day | |
2010-02-19 | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day | |
2010-02-18 | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day | |
2010-02-17 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 18, 2010 | |
2010-02-11 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-02-10 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2010-01-25 | to Health & Welfare (S) | |
2010-01-21 | received in Senate | |
2010-01-20 | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 | |
2010-01-15 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, January 19, 2010 | |
2010-01-15 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-01-14 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2010-01-11 | posted in committee | |
2010-01-05 | to Health & Welfare (H) | |
2010-01-05 | introduced in House | |
2010-11-04 | To: Interim Joint Committee on Education |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB51.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB51/bill.doc |