KY HB510 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 147)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 147)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 216 to define terms; require that the Cabinet for Health and Family Services collaborate with the UK and UL schools of dentistry to design and implement a pilot program to improve daily access to oral health care for nursing home residents; state funding mechanism; state activities that the pilot program shall fund; permit two nursing homes to share one aide depending on need; allow the cabinet to promulgate regulations; require a periodic evaluation and report.
Title
AN ACT relating to oral health in nursing homes and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Rep. Leslie Combs [D] | Rep. Kelly Flood [D] | Rep. Derrick Graham [D] | Rep. Joni Jenkins [D] |
Rep. Carl Rollins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 147) | |
2012-04-12 | delivered to Governor | |
2012-04-12 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2012-04-12 | passed 94-0 | |
2012-04-12 | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute | |
2012-04-12 | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute | |
2012-04-12 | to Rules (H) | |
2012-04-12 | received in House | |
2012-04-12 | passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute | |
2012-04-12 | floor amendments (1) (2) (3) and (4) withdrawn | |
2012-04-12 | committee amendments (1-title) (2) and (3) withdrawn | |
2012-04-12 | 3rd reading | |
2012-04-12 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders (2) of the Day for Thursday, April 12, 2012 | |
2012-04-12 | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute as a Consent Bill | |
2012-03-30 | recommitted to Health & Welfare (S) | |
2012-03-29 | floor amendments (1) (2) (3) and (4) filed | |
2012-03-29 | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with committee amendments (1-title) (2) and (3) | |
2012-03-28 | returned to Health & Welfare (S) | |
2012-03-28 | 1st reading | |
2012-03-28 | taken from Health & Welfare (S) | |
2012-03-26 | to Health & Welfare (S) | |
2012-03-22 | received in Senate | |
2012-03-21 | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 with Committee Substitute | |
2012-03-20 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 21, 2012 | |
2012-03-16 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-03-15 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2012-03-05 | posted in committee | |
2012-03-01 | to Health & Welfare (H) | |
2012-02-29 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB510.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB510/bill.doc |