KY HB52 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 75)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 75)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a new section of Subtitle 17A of KRS Chapter 304 to define “cancer screening, test, or procedure,” and to require coverage for certain cancer screenings, tests, and procedures; and amends KRS 18A.225, 164.2871, and 205.522 to require Medicaid, self-insured employer group health plans provided by the governing board of a state postsecondary education institution, and the state employee health plan to comply with the cancer coverage requirement, to provide that various sections apply to health benefit plans issued or renewed on or after January 1, 2025, to establish the construction of certain provisions for purposes of federal law and to require state officials to comply, to require that the Department of Insurance determine whether the coverage requirement for cancer detection would be in addition to essential health benefits required under federal law, and to require that the Department of Insurance and the Cabinet for Health and Family Services seek federal waivers, if necessary; EFFECTIVE, in part, January 1, 2025.
Title
AN ACT relating to coverage for cancer detection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 3085 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 174 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 174 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 75) |
2024-03-27 | House | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-27 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-27 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-27 | House | received in House |
2024-03-27 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-1 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2024-03-25 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2024-03-22 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2024-03-21 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2024-03-15 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2024-03-14 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2024-03-13 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 14, 2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2024-03-12 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2024-03-06 | Senate | to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-02-28 | House | 3rd reading, passed 98-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-02-27 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 28, 2024 |
2024-02-09 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-08 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-01-24 | House | to Health Services (H) |
2024-01-02 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-01-02 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Actuarial Analysis
Diseases
Education, Higher
Effective Dates, Delayed
Health and Medical Services
Health Benefit Mandate
Insurance, Health
Local Mandate
Medicaid
State Agencies
State Employees
Technical Corrections
Diseases
Education, Higher
Effective Dates, Delayed
Health and Medical Services
Health Benefit Mandate
Insurance, Health
Local Mandate
Medicaid
State Agencies
State Employees
Technical Corrections