MA H4924 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S109
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3-1)
Status: Introduced on July 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-08-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-08-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to supported decision making
Title
Relative to supported decision making
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-12 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Rules |
2024-07-29 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2024-07-29 | House | New draft of S109 and H201 |
2024-07-29 | House | Reported from the committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S109 (Replaces) 2024-07-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4924
H201 (Similar To) 2024-07-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4924
S819 (Similar To) 2024-03-06 - Accompanied H1257
H1591 (Similar To) 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
H201 (Similar To) 2024-07-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4924
S819 (Similar To) 2024-03-06 - Accompanied H1257
H1591 (Similar To) 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4924 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4924.pdf |