MA S109 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-01 - Reporting date extended to Friday July 26, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-01 - Reporting date extended to Friday July 26, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to supported decision-making agreements for certain adults with disabilities. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to supported decision-making agreements for certain adults with disabilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-01 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday July 26, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-05-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday May 2, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-09-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/18/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-07-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/19/2023 from 09:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H4395 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S109 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S109.pdf |