KY HB528 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 49)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 49)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amends KRS 65.7631 to extend the 5 percent rate of total monthly revenues deposited into the commercial mobile radio services (CMRS) fund for assisting with the adoption and operation of next-generation statewide 911 initiatives to July 1, 2025, with a 2.5 percent rate after that date, and to extend the 7.5 percent rate of total monthly revenues deposited into the CMRS fund for grants, matching money, or funds relating to 911 services to July 1, 2025, with a 10 percent rate after that date; and amends KRS 241.170 to grant full police powers of peace officers to the city administrator and the administrator’s investigators.
Title
AN ACT relating to public safety.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Hart [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 383 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 scta1 RSN# 3061 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 209 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 scta1 RSN# 3061 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 209 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 49) |
2024-03-28 | House | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-27 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-27 | House | passed 91-0 |
2024-03-27 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2024-03-27 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2024-03-26 | House | to Rules (H) |
2024-03-26 | House | received in House |
2024-03-26 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2024-03-25 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 26, 2024 |
2024-03-22 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2024-03-21 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-03-05 | House | 3rd reading, passed 94-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-02-28 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 29, 2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-27 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-02-16 | House | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (H) |
2024-02-14 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-02-14 | House | introduced in House |