KY HB535 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 122)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 122)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amends KRS 158.141 to require, beginning with the high school freshman class of 2025-2026, either a one-half credit course in civic literacy for graduation, including early graduation, or a score of 70 percent on a 100-question civics test, with local school districts selecting which option to use, to require that school districts submit annual civics testing data to the Kentucky Department of Education and to require that the department report cumulative data to the Legislative Research Commission, to provide a list of required topics to be taught in a civic literacy course, and to require that the Kentucky Board of Education promulgate administrative regulations establishing the academic standards for civic literacy.
Title
AN ACT relating to civic education.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Duvall [R] | Rep. James Tipton [R] | Rep. David Hale [R] | Rep. Scott Lewis [R] |
Rep. Shawn McPherson [R] | Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D] | Rep. Scott Sharp [R] | Rep. Walker Thomas [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 3101 (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 261 (Y: 77 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 261 (Y: 77 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 122) |
2024-03-28 | House | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-27 | House | received in House |
2024-03-27 | Senate | passed 32-1 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Floor Amendment (1) Defeated |
2024-03-27 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2024-03-26 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2024-03-25 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 26, 2024 |
2024-03-22 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2024-03-22 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-21 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-03-14 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2024-03-12 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-03-12 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-03-11 | House | 3rd reading, passed 77-13 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-06 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 07, 2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-05 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-02-22 | House | to Education (H) |
2024-02-14 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-02-14 | House | introduced in House |