KY HB537 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-16 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-16 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 7.105 to require the Legislative Research Commission to email electronic versions of the "final executive action" issue of the Legislative Record and the interim Legislative Record instead of mailing hard copies; allow the Commission to mail hard copies upon written request.
Title
AN ACT relating to legislative communications.
Sponsors
Rep. DJ Johnson [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 291 (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-16 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-03-14 | House | 3rd reading, passed 87-0 with floor amendment (1) |
2018-03-13 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 14, 2018 |
2018-03-09 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-08 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2018-03-08 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2018-03-06 | House | posted in committee |
2018-03-01 | House | to State Government (H) |
2018-02-27 | House | introduced in House |