KY HB538 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 76)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 76)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 158.150 to require a local board of education to expel a student for at least 12 months if the student makes threats that pose a danger to other students or staff; require a local board of education to adopt a policy requiring disciplinary actions for a student who assaults other students or staff off campus property; allow a local school board to place a student in an alternative education setting in lieu of expulsion, or at the end of an expulsion; allow a teacher to remove a disruptive student from the classroom; provide that a student who is removed from a classroom three times in 30 days shall be considered chronically disruptive and may be suspended; provide that a principal may permanently remove a disruptive student from a classroom and determine the placement of the student, subject to an appeal process; require a local board of education to conduct an expulsion review process to determine whether a student's expulsion shall continue or end.
Title
AN ACT relating to discipline of students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 322 (Y: 85 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 2680 (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 130 (Y: 89 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 2680 (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 130 (Y: 89 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 76) |
2023-03-16 | House | delivered to Governor |
2023-03-16 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2023-03-16 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2023-03-16 | House | passed 85-11 |
2023-03-16 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2023-03-16 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2023-03-16 | House | taken from Rules |
2023-03-16 | House | to Rules (H) |
2023-03-16 | House | received in House |
2023-03-16 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 34 -3 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2023-03-15 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 16, 2023 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2023-03-14 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2023-03-09 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | received in Senate |
2023-03-03 | House | 3rd reading, passed 89-6 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2023-03-02 | House | floor amendments (4) and (5) filed to Committee Substitute |
2023-03-01 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 02, 2023 |
2023-03-01 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2023-02-28 | House | floor amendments (2) and (3) filed to Committee Substitute |
2023-02-28 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2023-02-23 | House | to Education (H) |
2023-02-23 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2023-02-22 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-02-22 | House | introduced in House |