KY HB559 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 120)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 120)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 278.605 to allow for certain nuclear-based technologies as long as electricity is not the primary output of the processes.
Title
AN ACT relating to energy technologies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 120) | |
2012-03-30 | delivered to Governor | |
2012-03-30 | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate | |
2012-03-27 | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House | |
2012-03-27 | received in House | |
2012-03-26 | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 | |
2012-03-26 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 26, 2012 | |
2012-03-22 | reported favorably, to Rules as a Consent Bill | |
2012-03-21 | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2012-03-21 | 2nd reading | |
2012-03-21 | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2012-03-20 | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2012-03-20 | returned to Committee on Committees (S) | |
2012-03-20 | 1st reading | |
2012-03-20 | taken from Committee on Committees (S) | |
2012-03-15 | received in Senate | |
2012-03-14 | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 with Committee Substitute | |
2012-03-12 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 14, 2012 | |
2012-03-09 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-03-08 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2012-03-06 | posted in committee | |
2012-03-05 | to Tourism Development & Energy (H) | |
2012-03-01 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB559.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB559/bill.doc |