KY HB56 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 43)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 43)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amends KRS 154.32-090 to allow for a local jurisdiction that imposes an occupational license fee to request a waiver from the KY Economic Development Finance Authority to offer alternative inducements.
Title
AN ACT relating to economic development.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 43) | |
2012-03-30 | delivered to Governor | |
2012-03-30 | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate | |
2012-03-27 | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House | |
2012-03-27 | received in House | |
2012-03-26 | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 | |
2012-03-26 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 26, 2012 | |
2012-03-21 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-03-20 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2012-01-24 | to Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S) | |
2012-01-23 | received in Senate | |
2012-01-20 | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 | |
2012-01-17 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, January 20, 2012 | |
2012-01-17 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-01-12 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2012-01-10 | posted in committee | |
2012-01-03 | to Economic Development (H) | |
2012-01-03 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB56.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB56/bill.doc |