KY HB605 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - to Committee on Committees (S)
Pending: Senate Committee on Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - to Committee on Committees (S)
Pending: Senate Committee on Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 156 to allow the Kentucky Department of Education to enter into an agreement with a building and construction trade organization to develop a training program for school counselors on building and construction trades; provide professional development credit to school counselors and teachers, if resources allow, who participate in the program; require the department to include the training program on the electronic consumer bulletin board.
Title
AN ACT relating to professional development.
Sponsors
Rep. Timmy Truett [R] | Rep. Kimberly Banta [R] | Rep. Danny Bentley [R] | Rep. George Brown [D] |
Rep. Scott Lewis [R] | Rep. Bobby McCool [R] | Rep. Sarah Stalker [D] | Rep. Cherlynn Stevenson [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 320 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-22 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-03-22 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-03-21 | House | 3rd reading, passed 98-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-14 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 15, 2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-12 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-08 | House | to Education (H) |
2024-02-20 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-02-20 | House | introduced in House |