KY HB618 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-08 - to Health Services (S)
Pending: Senate Health Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-08 - to Health Services (S)
Pending: Senate Health Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 510.320 to define "sexually transmitted disease"; set requirements for tests for a sexually transmitted disease rather than human immunodeficiency virus; amend KRS 529.090 to define "sexually transmitted disease"; set requirements for tests for a sexually transmitted disease rather than human immunodeficiency; delete violation for a person who commits, offers, or agrees to commit prostitution by engaging in sexual activity in a manner likely to transmit the human immunodeficiency virus; provide that a person convicted of procuring another person to commit prostitution is guilty of a Class A misdemeanor if the person knew they had a sexually transmitted disease and could have transmitted the disease, rather than a Class D felony for a positive human immunodeficiency virus.
Title
AN ACT relating to the modernization of disease testing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 208 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | to Health Services (S) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-03-05 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 |
2024-03-01 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 04, 2024 |
2024-03-01 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-29 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-02-28 | House | to Health Services (H) |
2024-02-20 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-02-20 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Corrections Impact
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Diseases
Health and Medical Services
Judges and Court Commissioners
Local Mandate
Public Health
State Agencies
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Diseases
Health and Medical Services
Judges and Court Commissioners
Local Mandate
Public Health
State Agencies