KY HB63 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 43)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 43)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 21.540 to clarify the prohibitions established for trustees and employees of the board of the legislative and judicial retirement system and to define "de minimus".
Title
AN ACT relating to retirement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 43) |
2013-03-12 | House | delivered to Governor |
2013-03-12 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2013-03-07 | House | received in House |
2013-03-07 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2013 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill |
2013-03-05 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2013-03-05 | Senate | 1st reading |
2013-03-05 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2013-02-27 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2013-02-25 | Senate | received in Senate |
2013-02-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 |
2013-02-21 | House | floor amendment (2) withdrawn |
2013-02-19 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 20, 2013 |
2013-02-19 | House | floor amendment (2) filed |
2013-02-15 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2013-02-15 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-14 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2013-02-12 | House | posted in committee |
2013-01-08 | House | to State Government (H) |
2013-01-08 | House | introduced in House |