KY HB75 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on February 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-18 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 4)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on February 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-18 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 4)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 18A.150 to require that an employing state agency offer an interview to all finalists entitled to preference points if there are fewer than five finalists, and to no fewer than five if there are five or more; amend to clarify veteran eligibility.
Title
AN ACT relating to honoring military service.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Cherry [D] | Rep. Ron Crimm [R] | Rep. Keith Hall [D] | Rep. Jimmie Lee [D] |
Rep. Tim Moore [R] | Rep. Rick Nelson [D] | Rep. Tom Riner [D] | Rep. Thomas Thompson [D] |
Rep. Brent Yonts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-18 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 4) | |
2010-02-16 | delivered to Governor | |
2010-02-16 | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate | |
2010-02-11 | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House | |
2010-02-10 | received in House | |
2010-02-09 | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 | |
2010-02-08 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 9, 2010 | |
2010-02-01 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-01-28 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2010-01-21 | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) | |
2010-01-20 | received in Senate | |
2010-01-19 | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 | |
2010-01-14 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, January 15, 2010 | |
2010-01-14 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-01-13 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2010-01-11 | posted in committee | |
2010-01-11 | posting waived | |
2010-01-05 | to Military Affairs & Public Safety (H) | |
2010-01-05 | introduced in House | |
2010-11-04 | To: Interim Joint Committee on Veterans, Military Affairs and Public Protection |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB75.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB75/bill.doc |