KY HB75 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 55)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 55)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of Subtitle 12 of KRS Chapter 304 to define "insurance coverage" and "living donor"; prohibit certain insurance coverage determinations based upon the status of an individual as a living organ donor; amend KRS 2.240 to encourage the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to develop and circulate educational materials relating to living organ donation; provide that the Act applies to insurance policies issued, renewed, or declined on or after the effective date of the Act; provide that the Act may be cited as the "Living Organ Donor Protection Act of 2021."
Title
AN ACT relating to living organ donation.
Sponsors
Rep. Shawn McPherson [R] | Rep. Jerry Miller [R] | Rep. Tina Bojanowski [D] | Rep. Myron Dossett [R] |
Rep. Melinda Prunty [R] | Rep. Nancy Tate [R] | Rep. Billy Wesley [R] | Rep. Susan Westrom [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1687 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 84 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 84 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 55) |
2021-03-12 | House | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-12 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-12 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-11 | House | received in House |
2021-03-11 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 11, 2021 |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-04 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2021-02-26 | Senate | to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-02-23 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-02-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 |
2021-02-11 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 16, 2021 |
2021-02-11 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-10 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-01-13 | House | posted in committee |
2021-01-13 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2021-01-05 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-01-05 | House | introduced in House |
2020-10-21 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |