KY HB764 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 205.529 to remove reference to a Schedule III controlled substance containing hydrocodone in the program for synchronization of medications; amend KRS 218A.010 to add optometrist and physician assistant to the definition of "practitioner"; amend KRS 218A.172 to remove reference to a Schedule III controlled substance containing hydrocodone in the medications regulated; amend KRS 218A.182 to add charitable health care providers to the exemption from the requirement for an electronic prescription for a controlled substance; amend KRS 218A.202 to require an active account with the electronic monitoring system to prescribe and dispense controlled substances; amend KRS 218A.205 to remove reference to a Schedule III controlled substance containing hydrocodone in the medications regulated and prohibition on dispensing greater than a 48-hour supply of a Schedule II controlled substance; amend KRS 218A.245 to allow the cabinet to enter into contract with any federal agency of the United States; amend KRS 304.17A-165 to remove reference to a Schedule III controlled substance containing hydrocodone in the list of controlled substances allowed under a health benefit plan.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Kentucky All Schedule Prescription Electronic Reporting system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2024-03-27 | House | taken from the Orders of the Day |
2024-03-15 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-14 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-03-08 | House | to Health Services (H) |
2024-02-26 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-02-26 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Drugs and Medicines
Health and Medical Services
Hospitals and Nursing Homes
Nurses
Optometrists
Pharmacists
Physicians and Practitioners
State Agencies
Drugs and Medicines
Health and Medical Services
Hospitals and Nursing Homes
Nurses
Optometrists
Pharmacists
Physicians and Practitioners
State Agencies
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/24RS/hb764.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/24RS/hb764/orig_bill.pdf |