KY HB782 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 108)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 108)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a new section within KRS 15.530 to 15.590 to create the Public Safety Telecommunicator Work Group to develop a new delivery format for the public safety telecommunicator academy and to add training provisions for part-time telecommunicators hired before and after July 1, 2026; amends KRS 15.530 to define “public safety telecommunicator” and “public safety telecommunicator academy,” and to remove the “CJIS” and “non-CJIS” designations; amends KRS 15.540 to allow an agency seeking to hire a telecommunicator 120 days to certify the eligibility of an applicant to the Kentucky Law Enforcement Council and to require training regarding the Criminal Justice Information System (CJIS); amends KRS 15.560 to require that all telecommunicators complete the academy within 12 months of their hire date and to remove disparate requirements for CJIS and non-CJIS telecommunicators; amends KRS 15.565 to remove disparate requirements for CJIS and non-CJIS certification and to require that all telecommunicators complete CJIS in-service training recognized by the Kentucky State Police CJIS Services Agency; and amends KRS 15.590 to remove distinction of CJIS and non-CJIS telecommunicator academy and to recognize the public safety telecommunicators academy in its place; EFFECTIVE, in part, July 1, 2026.
Title
AN ACT relating to telecommunicators.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Lewis [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 427 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 3181 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 291 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 3181 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 291 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 108) |
2024-03-28 | House | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-28 | House | passed 96-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-28 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-28 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-28 | House | to Rules (H) |
2024-03-28 | House | received in House |
2024-03-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-28 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 28, 2024 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) as a consent bill |
2024-03-26 | Senate | returned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | 1st reading |
2024-03-26 | Senate | taken from Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2024-03-25 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2024-03-15 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-03-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-03-14 | House | 3rd reading, passed 94-0 |
2024-03-12 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 13, 2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-11 | House | returned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (H) |
2024-03-11 | House | 1st reading |
2024-03-11 | House | taken from Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (H) |
2024-03-01 | House | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (H) |
2024-02-26 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-02-26 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Advisory Boards, Commissions, and Committees
Background Checks
Cities
Counties
Effective Dates, Delayed
Local Government
Local Mandate
Occupations and Professions
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement
Public Safety
Sunset Legislation
Background Checks
Cities
Counties
Effective Dates, Delayed
Local Government
Local Mandate
Occupations and Professions
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement
Public Safety
Sunset Legislation