KY HB90 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-15)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-28 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-28 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of noncodified language to acknowledge Kentucky's high ranking in child abuse deaths and to recognize the importance of a pediatric abusive head trauma prevention program for new parents offered at several Louisville area hospitals; create a new section of KRS Chapter 216B to define the phrase "birthing center" and to strongly encourage all birthing centers in the Commonwealth to provide a program relating to the prevention of pediatric abusive head trauma at the time of discharge.
Title
AN ACT relating to educating parents and caregivers about pediatric abusive head trauma.
Sponsors
Sen. Julie Raque Adams [R] | Rep. Royce Adams [D] | Rep. Linda Belcher [D] | Rep. Kevin Bratcher [R] |
Rep. Dewayne Bunch [R] | Rep. John Carney [R] | Rep. Mike Cherry [D] | Rep. Tim Couch [R] |
Rep. Ron Crimm [R] | Rep. Jim DeCesare [R] | Rep. Bob DeWeese [R] | Rep. Theodore Edmonds [D] |
Rep. Kelly Flood [D] | Rep. David Floyd [R] | Rep. James Glenn [D] | Rep. Jim Gooch [R] |
Sen. Sara Gregory [R] | Rep. Richard Henderson [D] | Rep. David Housman [R] | Rep. Kim King [R] |
Rep. Jimmie Lee [D] | Rep. Mary Marzian [D] | Rep. Reginald Meeks [D] | Rep. Michael Meredith [R] |
Rep. Terry Mills [D] | Rep. Brad Montell [R] | Rep. Tim Moore [R] | Sen. Mike Nemes [R] |
Rep. David Osborne [R] | Rep. Marie Rader [R] | Rep. Jody Richards [D] | Rep. Tom Riner [D] |
Rep. Steven Rudy [R] | Rep. Tommy Turner [R] | Rep. Jim Wayne [D] | Rep. Susan Westrom [D] |
Rep. Addia Wuchner [R] | Rep. Jill York [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-28 | to Judiciary (S) | |
2011-02-24 | received in Senate | |
2011-02-23 | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 | |
2011-02-22 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 23, 2011 | |
2011-02-18 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-17 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-15 | posted in committee | |
2011-01-04 | to Health & Welfare (H) | |
2011-01-04 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB90.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB90/bill.doc |