KY HB99 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-21 - to Transportation (S)
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-21 - to Transportation (S)
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 186.412 to allow the operator's license or personal ID card of a person who his signed up to be an organ donor to bear the words "organ donor."
Title
AN ACT relating to operator's licenses and personal identification cards.
Sponsors
Rep. Joni Jenkins [D] | Rep. Tom Riner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-21 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2013-02-19 | Senate | received in Senate |
2013-02-15 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 |
2013-02-13 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 15, 2013 |
2013-02-13 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-12 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2013-02-07 | House | posted in committee |
2013-01-09 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2013-01-08 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/HB99.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/HB99/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/HB99/vote_history.pdf |