KY HB99 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-7)
Status: Passed on April 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 118)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-7)
Status: Passed on April 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 118)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 237.140, relating to concealed carry licenses for retired peace officers issued in conformity with the federal Law Enforcement Officers Safety Act to allow the annual license to be extended in yearly increments up to four times before a new license is issued; amend KRS 527.020 to allow LEOSA-certified retired peace officers to carry concealed deadly weapons under the same conditions as actively employed officers.
Title
AN ACT relating to the carrying of concealed deadly weapons by retired peace officers.
Sponsors
Rep. Addia Wuchner [R] | Rep. Denver Butler [D] | Rep. Robert Benvenuti [R] | Rep. Regina Huff [R] |
Rep. Hubert Collins [D] | Rep. Tim Couch [R] | Rep. Will Coursey [D] | Sen. C.B. Embry [R] |
Rep. Keith Hall [D] | Rep. Richard Heath [R] | Rep. Thomas Kerr [R] | Rep. Brian Linder [R] |
Rep. Donna Mayfield [R] | Rep. David Meade [R] | Rep. Tim Moore [R] | Rep. David Osborne [R] |
Rep. Marie Rader [R] | Rep. Tom Riner [D] | Rep. Sal Santoro [R] | Rep. Fitz Steele [D] |
Rep. Ken Upchurch [R] | Rep. Ben Waide [R] | Rep. Gerald Watkins [D] | Rep. Jill York [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-11 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 118) |
2014-03-31 | House | delivered to Governor |
2014-03-31 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2014-03-28 | House | received in House |
2014-03-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2014-03-28 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 28, 2014 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-03-26 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2014-03-25 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2014-03-24 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-03-21 | House | 3rd reading, passed 94-2 with Committee Substitute |
2014-03-18 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2014-03-18 | House | taken from Rules |
2014-03-13 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-03-12 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2014-03-10 | House | posted in committee |
2014-01-07 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2014-01-07 | House | introduced in House |