KY HJR90 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-23 - to Rules (H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-23 - to Rules (H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Direct the Legislative Research Commission to implement the recommended changes for staff management and structure contained in the April 2014 draft report provided to the Legislative Research Commission by the National Conference of State Legislatures.
Title
Direct the Legislative Research Commission to implement the recommended changes for staff management and structure contained in the April 2014 draft report provided to the Legislative Research Commission by the National Conference of State Legislatures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | House | to Rules (H) |
2015-03-23 | House | taken from the Regular Orders of the Day |
2015-02-23 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 24, 2015 |
2015-02-13 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-12 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2015-02-10 | House | posted in committee |
2015-02-05 | House | floor amendments (1) and (2-title) filed |
2015-02-05 | House | to State Government (H) |
2015-02-04 | House | introduced in House |