KY HR123 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognize May 16, 2024, and October 31, 2024, as Take Your Child to Vote Day.
Title
A RESOLUTION recognizing May 16, 2024, and October 31, 2024, as Take Your Child to Vote Day.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-22 | House | adopted by voice vote |
2024-03-22 | House | to House Floor |
2024-02-26 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-02-26 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/24RS/hr123.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/24RS/hr123/orig_bill.pdf |