KY SB101 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - placed in the Orders of the Day
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - placed in the Orders of the Day
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 247.801 to amend the definition of "agritourism activity"; define "working animal"; create a new section of KRS 247.800 to 247.810 to prohibit a city, town, county, or other political subdivision of the Commonwealth from restricting a person from engaging in an agritourism activity.
Title
AN ACT relating to agritourism.
Sponsors
Sen. Robin Webb [D] | Sen. Matthew Deneen [R] | Sen. Jason Howell [R] | Sen. Brandon Storm [R] |
Sen. Phillip Wheeler [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 sfa1 RSN# 3036 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2024-03-28 | House | taken from Rules |
2024-03-27 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2024-03-27 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-26 | House | returned to Agriculture (H) |
2024-03-26 | House | 1st reading |
2024-03-26 | House | taken from Agriculture (H) |
2024-03-25 | House | to Agriculture (H) |
2024-03-25 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-03-25 | House | received in House |
2024-03-22 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (1) |
2024-03-15 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 22, 2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2024-02-28 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-27 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-02-02 | Senate | reassigned to Agriculture (S) |
2024-01-11 | Senate | to Licensing & Occupations (S) |
2024-01-09 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-01-09 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Agriculture
Animals, Livestock, and Poultry
Cities
Counties
Local Government
Local Mandate
Planning and Zoning
Tourism
Animals, Livestock, and Poultry
Cities
Counties
Local Government
Local Mandate
Planning and Zoning
Tourism