KY SB102 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 234)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 234)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 158.4416 to require local superintendents to report information on school-based mental health services providers in the district to the Kentucky Department of Education; require the department to compile and maintain the information and report annually to the Interim Joint Committee on Education.
Title
AN ACT relating to mental health providers in schools.
Sponsors
Sen. George Wise [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 555 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 408 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 407 (Y: 66 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2023 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 408 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 407 (Y: 66 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2023 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 234) |
2022-04-13 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2022-04-13 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-04-13 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-04-13 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-04-13 | House | passed 97-0 |
2022-04-13 | House | House receded from Floor Amendment (3) |
2022-03-30 | House | posted for passage for receding from House floor amendment (3) |
2022-03-30 | House | taken from Rules (H) |
2022-03-29 | House | to Rules (H) |
2022-03-29 | House | received in House |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate refused to concur in House Floor Amendment (3) |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred in House floor amendments (1) and (2-title) |
2022-03-29 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Floor Amendments (1), (2-title) and (3) |
2022-03-25 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2022-03-25 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-03-25 | House | passed 91-0 with floor amendments (1) (3) and (2-title) |
2022-03-23 | House | floor amendments (3) and (4-title) filed |
2022-03-22 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 23, 2022 |
2022-03-21 | House | floor amendments (1) and (2-title) filed |
2022-03-18 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-17 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-03-14 | House | to Education (H) |
2022-02-15 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-02-15 | House | received in House |
2022-02-15 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 15, 2022 |
2022-02-11 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-02-10 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-01-24 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2022-01-21 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-01-21 | Senate | introduced in Senate |